CT HB05278 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 403
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 403
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide planning grants and other incentives for municipal transit-oriented development projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Incentives For Transit-oriented Development.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Tom O'Dea [R] | Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | File Number 403 |
2024-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 259 |
2024-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |