CT HB05278 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit an unauthorized intimate examination on a patient who is under deep sedation or anesthesia or unconscious.
Title
An Act Concerning Intimate Examinations, Continuing Medical Education In Screening For Endometriosis And The Effects Of Systemic Racism, Bias, Racial Disparities, And Experiences Of Transgender And Gender Diverse Persons On Patient Diagnosis, Care And Treatment, The Establishment Of An Endometriosis Data And Biorepository Program, And The Breast And Cervical Cancer Early Detection And Treatment Referral Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-06 | House | Public Act 22-33 |
2022-05-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | House | File Number 587 |
2022-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 426 |
2022-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4752 |
2022-03-31 | House | File Number 231 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 194 |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |