CT HB05278 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 435
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 435
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow contractors in distressed municipalities with less than thirty million dollars of revenue to qualify as small contractors under the set-aside program for small contractors and minority business enterprises.
Title
An Act Concerning The Eligibility Of Certain Contractors Located In Distressed Municipalities Under The Set-aside Program For Small Contractors And Minority Business Enterprises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 435 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 305 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |