CT HB05278 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To exclude the names and addresses of members of senior centers and participants in senior center programs from Freedom of Information Act disclosure requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning Senior Centers And The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-04-29 | Public Act 10-17 | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Calendar Number 379 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | |
2010-04-13 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House Passed | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 362 | |
2010-04-07 | House Calendar Number 195 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-03-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |