CT HB05275 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 229
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 229
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the threshold for exemption from certain auditing requirements for nonstate entities from three hundred thousand dollars to five hundred thousand dollars, specify the permissible time period for granting extensions to file certain audit reports and make technical changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Audits Of Certain Nonstate Entities Receiving State Financial Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | File Number 229 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 170 |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |