CT HB05271 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the application of certain temporary provisions concerning the permitting of outdoor food and beverage services and outdoor displays of goods until April 30, 2023, and delay the application of certain permanent provisions concerning the permitting of outdoor food and beverage services until May 1, 2023.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Outdoor Food And Beverage Services And Outdoor Displays Of Goods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 47 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 121 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 121 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Public Act 22-1 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 62 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2022-03-16 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended |
2022-03-14 | House | File Number 8 |
2022-03-14 | House | House Calendar Number 40 |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 10:00 AM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |