CT HB05267 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To redefine "privatization contract" and "state contracting agency", modify the quorum requirement of the State Contracting Standards Board, impose additional requirements on proposed privatization contracts and require the Auditors of Public Accounts to issue compliance reports regarding staffing levels of the State Contracting Standards Board.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Contracting Standards Board And Requirements For Privatization Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Motion Failed (JF) |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 431 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 301 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |