CT HB05262 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide workers' compensation for current and former uniformed members of a paid or volunteer fire department who suffer from certain diseases as a result of performing their jobs.
Title
An Act Establishing A Firefighters Cancer Relief Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 174 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Public Act 16-10 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | Senate | File Number 691 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 443 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4495 |
2016-04-06 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-15 | House | File Number 44 |
2016-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 68 |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |