CT HB05260 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - File Number 126
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - File Number 126
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to submit a report concerning short-term assessment and respite group homes for children that are operated or licensed by the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Requiring An Evaluation Of Short-term Assessment And Respite Group Homes For Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | File Number 126 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 112 |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |