CT HB05254 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Public Hearing 02/04
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Public Hearing 02/04
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enable municipalities such as Bolton, Bozrah, Bloomfield, Bethany, Coventry, Hartford, Lyme, New London, Norfolk, North Stonington and Warren to impose a conveyance tax on certain real property sales in order to generate funds for the preservation of open space.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program Authorizing Municipalities To Impose A Buyer's Conveyance Fee On Real Property To Fund The Purchase And Stewardship Of Open Space.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-01-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |