CT HB05245 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - File Number 359
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - File Number 359
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the privatization of group homes.
Title
An Act Concerning A Report On The Privatization Of Group Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | File Number 359 | |
2010-04-07 | House Calendar Number 192 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |