CT HB05237 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent employers from requiring certain employees or prospective employees to disclose any criminal history until the employer has made a conditional offer of employment to such employee or prospective employee.
Title
An Act Concerning Fair Chance Employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 370 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 134 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 134 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 16-83 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-27 | Senate | File Number 737 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 510 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4971 |
2016-04-21 | House | File Number 685 |
2016-04-21 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-21 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 175 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 140 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |