CT HB05231 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - File Number 626
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require an insurance company doing business in this state, or agent, adjuster or third-party claims administrator for such company to provide additional disclosures to an insured regarding such insured's right to choose a licensed repair shop or glass shop where such insured's motor vehicle physical damage or automotive glass work will be performed.
Title
An Act Concerning Automotive Glass Work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 AS AMENDED (Y: 111 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | File Number 626 | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Calendar Number 463 | |
2012-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-02 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-02 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4285 | |
2012-03-26 | File Number 97 | |
2012-03-26 | House Calendar Number 109 | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |