CT HB05229 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Senate Calendar Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Senate Calendar Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require law enforcement officials to report investigations regarding minors who have been served alcohol by liquor permittees to the Department of Consumer Protection.
Title
An Act Requiring Law Enforcement Reporting Of The Service Of Alcohol To Minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Senate Calendar Number 572 | |
2010-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-05 | House Passed | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 420 | |
2010-04-08 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-08 | New File by Committee on Public Safety | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-31 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-23 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety | |
2010-03-16 | File Number 57 | |
2010-03-16 | House Calendar Number 45 | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-04 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |