CT HB05228 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 325
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 325
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the issuance of state funds for municipalities and nonprofits to purchase options to purchase preserved agricultural lands at agricultural value.
Title
An Act Concerning The Purchase Of Certain Lands At Agricultural Value.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Rep. Maria Horn [D] | Rep. Ben Mcgorty [R] |
Sen. Jan Hochadel [D] | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] | Sen. MD Rahman [D] | Rep. Gregory Haddad [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | File Number 325 |
2024-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 220 |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |