CT HB05227 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Public Hearing 03/11
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the regulation of firearms by municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Regulation Of Firearms By Municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-21HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-01HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseChange of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-16HouseChange of Reference Judiciary
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback