CT HB05209 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow senior citizens and others to transfer real property at death to avert costly, time-consuming probate proceedings.
Title
An Act Concerning The Adoption Of The Uniform Real Property Transfer On Death Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |