CT HB05204 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require (1) an assessment of the state-wide need for affordable housing and an allocation of such need to planning regions and municipalities, (2) the creation of affordable housing plans for each municipality, and (3) a study concerning the municipalities' performance in meeting the requirements of such plans.
Title
An Act Concerning A Needs Assessment And Fair Share Plans For Municipalities To Increase Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Rep. Jason Rojas [D] | Rep. Christine Palm [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Joshua Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-04 | House | File Number 286 |
2022-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 204 |
2022-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |