CT HB05203 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To help alleviate financial burdens on elderly homeowners by permitting municipalities to defer property taxes for those who qualify for such tax deferrals.
Title
An Act Concerning Property Tax Deferral For Elderly Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |