CT HB05197 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To adopt the social work licensure compact.
Title
An Act Concerning Social Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 242 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-14 | House | Public Act 24-30 |
2024-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 339 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | File Number 26 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 50 |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |