CT HB05186 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - File Number 9
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - File Number 9
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require youth coaches of youth athletic activities conducted on fields, courts and recreational areas owned, operated or managed by municipalities to annually view an informational video regarding concussions.
Title
An Act Concerning Concussion Education For Coaches Of Certain Youth Athletic Activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | File Number 9 |
2018-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 37 |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |