CT HB05170 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish requirements for the adequate sheltering of dogs and add additional requirements concerning the tethering of dogs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Tethering And Sheltering Of Dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 329 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 22-59 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 532 |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6045 |
2022-03-29 | House | File Number 178 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 151 |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |