CT HB05169 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Office of Policy and Management concerning property tax exemptions, special taxing districts, neglected cemeteries, revaluation of real property, property tax assessment and appeals, tax overpayment refunds, tax collection, payment in lieu of taxes and the elimination of municipal requirements relating to fiscal disparities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Intergovernmental Policy And Planning Division Within The Office Of Policy And Management And The Extension Of The Commission On Connecticut’s Development And Future.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 367 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 69 AS AMENDED (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 69 AS AMENDED (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-74 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | House | File Number 584 |
2022-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 422 |
2022-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4908 |
2022-03-16 | House | File Number 25 |
2022-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 52 |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |