CT HB05160 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - File Number 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - File Number 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of the Office of Early Childhood to adopt regulations requiring child care centers, group child care homes and family child care homes to maintain liability insurance coverage.
Title
An Act Concerning The Maintenance Of Liability Insurance Coverage By Child Care Centers, Group Child Care Homes And Family Child Care Homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | File Number 23 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 47 |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |