CT HB05160 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/18
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/18
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To recognize and compensate Ms. Patricia "Pidgie" D'Allessio for her role in the identification, arrest and conviction of serial predator Robert Nelson Malm, who sexually assaulted Ms. D'Allessio and sexually assaulted and murdered eleven-year-old Irene Fiederowicz.
Title
An Act Requiring The Payment Of A Reward To Patricia "pidgie" D'allessio.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |