CT HB05160 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow persons sixteen years of age and older to donate blood.
Title
An Act Concerning The Donation Of Blood By Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 315 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed |
2018-03-20 | House | File Number 15 |
2018-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 43 |
2018-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |