CT HB05149 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To allow (1) beer manufacturer permittees to sell and deliver kegs of beer at locations in this state that are within a five-mile radius of their permit premises, (2) package store permittees to provide fee-based spirits tastings, and (3) Connecticut craft cafe permittees to sell additional alcoholic beverages manufactured in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Cafe And Package Store Permittees.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D] | Rep. Irene Haines [R] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] |
Rep. Martin Foncello [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Sen. Lisa Seminara [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 301 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-17 | House | Public Act 24-85 |
2024-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 371 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2024-03-21 | House | File Number 76 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 79 |
2024-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |