CT HB05149 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to undertake a study regarding home improvement contractors.
Title
An Act Requiring The Commissioner Of Consumer Protection To Undertake A Study Regarding Home Improvement Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 539 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 131 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 131 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-07 | House | Special Act 13-18 |
2013-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-13 | House | File Number 798 |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 583 |
2013-05-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5770 |
2013-03-26 | House | File Number 158 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 121 |
2013-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |