CT HB05147 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the penalty for subsequent animal abuse offenses and generally prohibit the availability of accelerated rehabilitation for such subsequent offenses.
Title
An Act Increasing The Maximum Penalty For Persons Convicted Of Subsequent Offenses Of Malicious And Intentional Animal Cruelty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 428 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 428 CONSENT CALENDAR 3 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-96 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 578 |
2016-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-09 | House | File Number 11 |
2016-03-09 | House | House Calendar Number 49 |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |