CT HB05137 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To revise the property tax exemption for certain renewable energy sources and hydropower facilities.
Title
An Act Expanding The Property Tax Exemption For Certain Residential Renewable Energy Sources And Nonresidential Hydropower Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |