CT HB05134 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a tax credit for certain employers that provide paid family and medical leave benefits to their employees.
Title
An Act Establishing A Tax Credit For Certain Employers That Provide Paid Family And Medical Leave Benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2018-04-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2018-02-21 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |