CT HB05129 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 455
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require institutions of higher education to provide options for substance-free housing on campus.
Title
An Act Concerning Substance-free Housing On College Campuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 157 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 455 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2024-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2024-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5616 |
2024-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5416 |
2024-03-14 | House | File Number 32 |
2024-03-14 | House | House Calendar Number 53 |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |