CT HB05129 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To raise awareness and provide funding for efforts to fight aquatic invasive species and cyanobacteria blooms that threaten the state's lakes and ponds.
Title
An Act Establishing A "save Our Lakes" Number Plate To Combat Aquatic Invasive Species And Cyanobacteria Blooms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 359 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | House | Public Act 18-101 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 445 |
2018-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2018-03-12 | House | House Calendar Number 34 |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-12 | House | File Number 2 |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |