CT HB05080 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-26 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-26 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require certain employers to either allow their employees to decline to work on family holidays without penalty or to provide such employees with enhanced pay on such holidays.
Title
An Act Concerning Large Retail Stores And Employment Of Workers During The Holiday Season.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2015-02-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-23 | House | Public Hearing 01/29 |
2015-01-15 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |