CT HB05074 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - File Number 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - File Number 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study employee working conditions in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Employee Working Conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | File Number 2 |
2016-03-03 | House | House Calendar Number 38 |
2016-03-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |