CT HB05058 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Adopting The Nurse Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 261 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 31 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 31 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-17 | House | Public Act 24-83 |
2024-05-08 | House | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-22 | Senate | File Number 601 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 340 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-18 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4103 |
2024-03-26 | House | File Number 122 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 108 |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |