CT HB05056 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - Senate Calendar Number 420
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - Senate Calendar Number 420
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To add nonresident pharmacies and other dispensers to the electronic prescription drug monitoring program and to allow the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to identify products to be included in said program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Electronic Prescription Drug Monitoring Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Senate Calendar Number 420 | |
2012-04-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-19 | House Passed | |
2012-03-26 | File Number 92 | |
2012-03-26 | House Calendar Number 104 | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-16 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |