CT HB05053 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Opioids And Access To Overdose Reversal Drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 316 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 320 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 114 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 320 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 114 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-10 | House | Public Act 16-43 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-27 | House | File Number 736 |
2016-04-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 519 |
2016-04-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4795 |
2016-04-06 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-29 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-29 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-03-08 | House | File Number 7 |
2016-03-08 | House | House Calendar Number 42 |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |