CT HB05052 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Supporting Solar Energy In Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-22 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-09 | House | File Number 358 |
2024-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 233 |
2024-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |