CT HB05045 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Reducing Lead Poisoning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 333 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 22-49 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | File Number 666 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 501 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5452 |
2022-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-24 | House | File Number 114 |
2022-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 117 |
2022-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |