CT HB05043 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - File Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - File Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for at least a twenty-minute consultation between a health care provider and a covered individual concerning the immunizations that are recommended for such individual by the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Certain Immunization Consultations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | File Number 3 |
2020-03-10 | House | House Calendar Number 34 |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/20 5:00 PM |
2020-02-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |