CT HB05041 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 530
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 530
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Home Energy Affordability For Home Renters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 174 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 530 |
2022-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2022-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6074 |
2022-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6022 |
2022-04-04 | House | File Number 270 |
2022-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 201 |
2022-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |