CT HB05018 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated, And The Connecticut Development Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Donovan [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. David Scribner [R] | Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] |
Sen. Donald Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-18 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-12 | File Number 379 | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 289 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-27 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |