CT HB05018 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - File Number 537
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - File Number 537
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Making Adjustments To State Expenditures For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | File Number 537 | |
2010-04-14 | House Calendar Number 315 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing 02/19 | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/17 | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/11 | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |