CT HB05005 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Public Hearing 02/21
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Feb 21 Appropriations Public Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Adjusting The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2020-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2020-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/18
2020-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2020-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/13
2020-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/11
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback