CT HB05004 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish early voting beginning in 2023 for certain elections and beginning in 2024 for certain primaries, special elections and referenda, (2) establish the number of days and hours of, and implement procedures for the conduct of, such early voting, (3) provide for same-day election and same-day primary registrations during periods of early voting, (4) make conforming changes to deadlines for the performance of certain duties prior to an election or primary, and (5) require the Secretary of the State to undertake efforts to educate the public about early voting and train registrars of voters regarding the administration of early voting.
Title
An Act Implementing Early Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 291 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 282 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 283 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 284 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 285 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 286 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 288 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 289 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 290 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 67 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 51 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 68 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 50 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 69 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 50 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 70 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 71 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 50 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 72 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 50 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 73 AS AMENDED (Y: 107 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 282 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 283 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 284 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 285 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 286 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 288 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 289 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 290 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 67 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 51 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 68 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 50 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 69 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 50 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 70 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 71 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 50 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 72 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 50 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 73 AS AMENDED (Y: 107 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-05 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-01 | House | Public Act 23-5 |
2023-05-30 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule I 8954 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 8955 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 8959 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 8958 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8962 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8961 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8957 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8963 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7878 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-08 | Senate | File Number 756 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 461 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-04 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 7407 |
2023-05-04 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 7393 |
2023-05-04 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 7268 |
2023-05-04 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 7383 |
2023-05-04 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 7382 |
2023-05-04 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7364 |
2023-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7397 |
2023-05-02 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-02 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | House | File Number 350 |
2023-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 237 |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-02-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |