CO SR010 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning declaring the week of May 12-18, 2019, as Police Week, and, in connection therewith, declaring May 15, 2019, as Peace Officers' Memorial Day.
Title
Police Week And Peace Officers' Memorial Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |