CO SM001 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 11/01/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 11/01/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing congress to repeal the federal law establishing the annual advancement of time known as "daylight saving time" and leave the United States on standard time year-round.
Title
Memorializing Congress Repeal Daylight Saving Time
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 11/01/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/16/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sm20-001 |
Text | https://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_sm001_01.pdf |