CO SM001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing the president of the United States to support veterans who honorably served in the United States military.
Title
Legal Resident Military Veteran Deportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Memorial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |