CO SJR023 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Colorado "Public Lands Day", and, in connection therewith, recognizing May 15, 2021, as the fifth annual "Public Lands Day" in Colorado.
Title
Colorado Public Lands Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/14/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |